MD HB812 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-8)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Exempting veterans and persons serving on active duty in the armed forces of the United States from any practical or field components of the course of instruction in competency and safety in the handling of firearms; and requiring the Department of Natural Resources to issue a Certificate of Competency and Safety to a veteran or person serving on active duty in the armed forces of the United States on successful completion of the written examination only.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hunting - Certificate of Competency and Safety - Veterans and Active Duty Military

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-11HouseUnfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
2013-02-22HouseHearing 2/22 at 2:00 p.m.
2013-02-21HouseHearing cancelled
2013-02-22HouseHearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2013-02-06HouseFirst Reading Environmental Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback