MD HB811 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 781
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 781
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain individuals employed by federal agencies to comply with certain provisions of law; establishing that an applicant to obtain a certified social worker license is required to meet certain requirements by December 31, 2023; altering the number of hours of certain supervision an applicant for a certified social worker-clinical license is required to complete; specifying that certain supervision is to be provided in accordance with regulations adopted by the State Board of Social Work Examiners; etc.
Title
State Board of Social Work Examiners - Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 781 |
2021-04-12 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2021-03-04 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments {156583/1 Adopted |
2021-03-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2021-02-02 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-29 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB597 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 782
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Discipline
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Ethics
Examinations
Federal Government
Fines
Health Occupations
internet
Licenses
Managers and Supervisors
Medical Conditions
Mental and Behavioral Health
Names
Penalties and Sentences
Records
Rules and Regulations
Social Workers
Substance Abuse
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Discipline
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Ethics
Examinations
Federal Government
Fines
Health Occupations
internet
Licenses
Managers and Supervisors
Medical Conditions
Mental and Behavioral Health
Names
Penalties and Sentences
Records
Rules and Regulations
Social Workers
Substance Abuse
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 19 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 19 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 19 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 19 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 19 | 302.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 19 | 302.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 19 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 19 | 307 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 19 | 308 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 19 | 309 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 19 | 311 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 19 | 315 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 19 | 317 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 19 | 318 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 19 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 19 | 407 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 19 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |