MD HB811 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-27 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-27 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting an action to foreclose a lien on residential property that is brought by the governing body of a common ownership community under the Maryland Contract Lien Act from specified foreclosure procedures; subjecting an action to foreclose a lien on residential property that is brought by the governing body of a common ownership community under the Maryland Contract Lien Act to specified timing, notice, disclosure, service, publication, right to cure, and limitation of action provisions; etc.
Title
Residential Property - Foreclosure of Liens by Common Ownership Communities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2013-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {310711/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters |
2013-02-21 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-06 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Condominiums
Contracts
Cooperative Associations
Corporations
Financial Regulation, Division of
Foreclosure
Homeowners Associations
Housing
Liens
News Media
Notices
Postal Service
Real Property
Rules and Regulations
Contracts
Cooperative Associations
Corporations
Financial Regulation, Division of
Foreclosure
Homeowners Associations
Housing
Liens
News Media
Notices
Postal Service
Real Property
Rules and Regulations