MD HB811 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing an individual to notify the local department of social services or the appropriate law enforcement agency if the individual has reason to believe that a parent, guardian, or caregiver allows a child to reside with or be in the regular presence of a specified individual, other than the child's parent or guardian, and who, based on specified information, poses a substantial risk of sexual abuse to the child; providing for the manner of reporting; etc.
Title
Child Protection - Reporting of Children Living with or in the Regular Presence
Sponsors
Del. Norman Conway [D] | Del. Steven DeBoy [D] | Del. Kathleen Dumais [D] | Del. James Malone [D] |
Sen. Roger Manno [D] | Sen. Jim Mathias [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-04 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) | |
2010-04-03 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-03 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-07 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-03-26 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-04-02 | Passed Enrolled | |
2010-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2010-04-02 | House Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2010-03-23 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | |
2010-03-22 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-24 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | |
2010-02-09 | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-09 | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Child Abuse and Neglect
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Ex-Offenders
Expungement
Health Occupations
Human Resources, Department of
Investigations and Inquiries
Judges
Law Enforcement
Liability
Minors
Notices
Parole and Probation
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sexual Offenses
Social Services
Social Workers
Teachers
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Ex-Offenders
Expungement
Health Occupations
Human Resources, Department of
Investigations and Inquiries
Judges
Law Enforcement
Liability
Minors
Notices
Parole and Probation
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sexual Offenses
Social Services
Social Workers
Teachers