MD HB81 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 45
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 45
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the crime of sodomy; making conforming changes; clarifying that certain evidence is not admissible as an infamous crime; providing that a conviction before October 1, 2020, for sodomy may not be expunged under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Criminal Law – Sodomy – Repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 124 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 45 |
2020-03-18 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2020-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (124-4) |
2020-03-18 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {908475/1 Adopted |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2020-02-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-5) |
2020-02-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {722811/1 Adopted |
2020-02-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2020-01-14 | House | Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-13 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB735 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-15 - Referred Judiciary
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Expungement
Minors
Sexual Offenses
Vulnerable Adults
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Expungement
Minors
Sexual Offenses
Vulnerable Adults
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 10 | 905 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 10 | 105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 11 | 1007 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 11 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 2 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 3 | 321 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 3 | 322 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 3 | 602 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 3 | 604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 3 | 809 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 5 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |