MD HB809 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 5 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Defining "telephone answering service" for the purpose of establishing that the service is taxable under the sales and use tax only if the service consists exclusively of answering a telephone either by an automated system or by a live operator, taking messages, and transmitting messages to the customer; and establishing that a telephone answering service is not a taxable service if certain acts are only incidental to and less than 5% of the service provider's total gross receipts in a calendar year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales and Use Tax - Taxable Services - Telephone Answering Service

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-2) (Y: 137 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-05HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-04-04SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-04SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-04SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-03-20SenateHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (136-2)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {795264/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-02-12HouseHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback