MD HB803 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 193
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 193
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the method by which administrative fees for participants in the State Retirement and Pension System are calculated by and remitted to the State Retirement and Pension System; and requiring the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System to provide certain notice to local participating employers.
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Administrative Fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-18 - House - Floor Amendment 603025/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (Y: 35 N: 99 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-18 - House - Floor Amendment 603025/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (Y: 35 N: 99 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-24 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 193 |
2023-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2023-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2023-04-08 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {873821/1 Adopted |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2023-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2023-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-18 | House | Floor Amendment {603025/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (35-99) |
2023-03-17 | House | Motion Special Order until 3/18 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted |
2023-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {503022/1 Adopted |
2023-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2023-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-08 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB834 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 194
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Fees
Notices
Retirement
Revenue and Taxes
State Employees
State Government - Pensions and Retirement
Fees
Notices
Retirement
Revenue and Taxes
State Employees
State Government - Pensions and Retirement
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Personnel and Pensions | 21 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 21 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 21 | 316 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |