MD HB801 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-02 - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-02 - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the membership of the Commission on Maryland Cybersecurity Innovation and Excellence; requiring that, to the extent practicable, specified members of the Commission reasonably reflect the geographic, racial, ethnic, cultural, and gender diversity of the State; requiring the Commission to work, with specified others, to develop strategies to enable organizations that adopt telemedicine to practice safe security techniques to minimize successful cyber attacks; altering the termination date of the Commission; etc.
Title
Commission on Maryland Cybersecurity Innovation and Excellence - Membership, Duties, and Termination Date
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (127-4) (Y: 127 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | Senate | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-14 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2014-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (127-4) |
2014-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {283093/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2014-02-26 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Electronic Commerce
Electronic Government
Health
Reports
Safety
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Electronic Commerce
Electronic Government
Health
Reports
Safety
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology