MD HB800 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 320
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 320
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Specifying that 25% of the net recovery by the debtor on a claim for workers' compensation is subject to execution on a judgment for a child support arrearage.
Title
Execution on a Judgment - Child Support Arrearages - Workers' Compensation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 320 |
2023-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (42-0) |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2023-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2023-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {163124/1 Adopted |
2023-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2023-02-09 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB71 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 321
Subjects
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Debt Collection
Injury
Judgments
Support of Dependents
Workers' Compensation
Debt Collection
Injury
Judgments
Support of Dependents
Workers' Compensation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 11 | 504 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |