MD HB794 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 504
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 504
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Baltimore Regional Transit Commission to review and comment on annual budget requests of the Maryland Transit Administration, updates to the Central Maryland Transportation Plan, and certain annual reports and to perform other oversight and advocacy duties related to Baltimore region transit services; and requiring the Commission, by December 1 each year, to report its findings and recommendations on the Baltimore region transit systems to the Administration, the Governor, and the General Assembly.
Title
Baltimore Regional Transit Commission - Establishment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 109 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 103 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 103 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 504 |
2023-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2023-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (109-29) |
2023-04-08 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (37-8) |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {793525/1 Adopted |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2023-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (103-34) |
2023-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {363126/1 Adopted |
2023-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2023-02-14 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) |
2023-02-08 | House | First Reading Appropriations and Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB876 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-26 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Baltimore Metropolitan Council
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Electronic Government
internet
Mass Transit
meetings
Open Government
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Work, Labor, and Employment
Zoning and Planning
Baltimore Metropolitan Council
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Electronic Government
internet
Mass Transit
meetings
Open Government
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Work, Labor, and Employment
Zoning and Planning
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 7 | 213 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |