MD HB791 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 389
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 389
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the credit against the State income tax for qualified electric vehicle recharging equipment for specified tax years; providing for the amount of tax credit certificates that may be issued by the Maryland Energy Administration; altering the amount of credit that specified vehicles may claim; establishing that the credit is subject to available funding; transferring a specified amount of money from the Strategic Energy Investment Fund to the Transportation Trust Fund for fiscal year 2014; etc.
Title
Tax Credits - Electric Vehicles - Extensions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-6) (Y: 131 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-6) (Y: 131 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-6) (Y: 131 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 389 |
2013-04-04 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2013-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-6) |
2013-04-04 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {109331/1 Report Adopted |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-15 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2013-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-6) |
2013-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-12 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-11 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2013-02-28 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-06 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Appropriations
Energy Matters
Equipment
Excise Tax
Income Tax
Motor Vehicles
Revenue and Taxes
Tax Credits
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous
Appropriations
Energy Matters
Equipment
Excise Tax
Income Tax
Motor Vehicles
Revenue and Taxes
Tax Credits
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous