MD HB788 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 227
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 227
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the limitation on the number of community benefits district management authorities that the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore may establish.
Title
Baltimore City - Community Benefits Districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 227 |
2018-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2018-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-17 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-01 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |