MD HB780 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-6)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 612
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-6)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 612
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that competitive sealed proposals is the preferred procurement method for a contract for security services with an expected value that is greater than $1,000,000.
Title
Competitive Sealed Proposals - Security Contracts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 612 |
2024-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2024-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2024-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {673321/1 Adopted |
2024-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2024-02-02 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-31 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 13 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |