MD HB779 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Governor, for fiscal years 2021 through 2035, to include in the annual State operating budget at least $16,660,000 in general funds for each historically black college and university in the State; providing for the allowable uses of certain funds; and providing that certain funds be in addition to certain base funds appropriated to certain institutions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher Education - Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Funding

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HouseUnfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
2019-03-01HouseHearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m.
2019-03-01HouseHearing canceled
2019-02-14HouseHearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-14HouseHearing canceled
2019-02-11HouseHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback