MD HB773 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-09 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-09 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting Baltimore County from the requirement to establish a watershed protection and restoration program on or before July 1, 2013.
Title
Baltimore County - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Exemption
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-09 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2015-03-04 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Baltimore County
Counties - Local Laws
Environment
Environment, Department of
Fees
Flood Control
Grants
Laws and Ordinances
Licenses
Municipal Corporations
Pollution
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rivers and Streams
Rules and Regulations
Wetlands
Counties - Local Laws
Environment
Environment, Department of
Fees
Flood Control
Grants
Laws and Ordinances
Licenses
Municipal Corporations
Pollution
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rivers and Streams
Rules and Regulations
Wetlands