MD HB770 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring, for the purpose of collective bargaining, that employees of the Enoch Pratt Free Library be considered persons holding a position in the service of the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore and specifying that the employees are not special appointees.
Title
Enoch Pratt Free Library - Collective Bargaining
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2022-03-01 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-09 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-03 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Charters
Collective Bargaining
Libraries
Social Services - Generally
Work, Labor, and Employment
Charters
Collective Bargaining
Libraries
Social Services - Generally
Work, Labor, and Employment