MD HB768 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 94-7)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 692
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 94-7)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 692
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Prescription Drug Affordability Board to protect State residents and certain stakeholders from the high costs of prescription drug products; requiring the Board to collect data and identify prescription drug products that may cause affordability challenges; authorizing the Board to meet in closed session when discussing trade secrets; authorizing the Board to set an upper payment limit for certain drug products; creating a Stakeholder Council to assist the Board with certain reporting requirements; etc.
Title
Health - Prescription Drug Affordability Board
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (38-8) (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (96-37) (Y: 96 N: 37 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (98-40) (Y: 98 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {903025/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (40-93) (Y: 40 N: 93 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-03-18 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {493826/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (39-95) (Y: 39 N: 95 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (96-37) (Y: 96 N: 37 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (98-40) (Y: 98 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {903025/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (40-93) (Y: 40 N: 93 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-03-18 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {493826/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (39-95) (Y: 39 N: 95 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 692 |
2019-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (38-8) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2019-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (96-37) |
2019-04-08 | House | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Senators Feldman, Klausmeier, and Reilly |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Recede |
2019-04-05 | House | Delegates Cullison, Pena-Melnyk, and Kipke |
2019-04-05 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2019-04-05 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2019-04-05 | House | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {887275/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-03-28 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2019-03-27 | House | Third Reading Passed (98-40) |
2019-03-26 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-26 | House | Floor Amendment {903025/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (40-93) |
2019-03-26 | House | Floor Amendment {493826/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (39-95) |
2019-03-25 | House | Special Order until 03/26 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted |
2019-03-25 | House | Favorable with Amendments {886582/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-25 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-02-13 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Advertising
Appeals
Assessments
Attorney General
Auditors and Audits
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Comptroller
Consumer Price Index
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Correctional Institutions
Data
Demographics
Disclosure
Drugs
Ethics
Examinations
Federal Government
Fees
Governor
Health
Health Care Commission
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Industry and Technology
Information Technology, Department of
Insurance - Health
Labeling
Legislative Policy Committee
Managed Care Organizations
Medical Assistance
Medical Research
Medical Treatments
Minorities
Notices
Open Government
Patients
Pharmacy Benefits Managers
Prices
Privacy
Procurement
Public Health
Public Information
Publications
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Social Services
State Hospitals
State Universities and Colleges
Tax Returns
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Treasurers
Voting
Weights and Measures
Witnesses
Appeals
Assessments
Attorney General
Auditors and Audits
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Comptroller
Consumer Price Index
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Correctional Institutions
Data
Demographics
Disclosure
Drugs
Ethics
Examinations
Federal Government
Fees
Governor
Health
Health Care Commission
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Industry and Technology
Information Technology, Department of
Insurance - Health
Labeling
Legislative Policy Committee
Managed Care Organizations
Medical Assistance
Medical Research
Medical Treatments
Minorities
Notices
Open Government
Patients
Pharmacy Benefits Managers
Prices
Privacy
Procurement
Public Health
Public Information
Publications
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Social Services
State Hospitals
State Universities and Colleges
Tax Returns
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Treasurers
Voting
Weights and Measures
Witnesses