MD HB768 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Board of Trustees of the State Retirement and Pension System to suspend the application of annual retirement allowance adjustments to specified retirees of the Maryland School for the Deaf for a specified period of time until specified retirement allowances equal a specified amount; requiring the Board of Trustees to resume the application of annual retirement allowance adjustments to specified retirees under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Employees' Retirement and Pension Systems - Maryland School for the Deaf
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-07 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2010-04-07 | Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2010-04-05 | Senators McFadden, Kasemeyer, and Munson | |
2010-04-05 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2010-04-05 | Senate Refuses to Recede | |
2010-04-02 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) | |
2010-04-01 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-01 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-05 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2010-03-30 | Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-27 | First Reading Budget and Taxation | |
2010-04-07 | Passed Enrolled | |
2010-04-04 | Third Reading Passed (129-7) | |
2010-04-04 | Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2010-04-01 | Delegates Griffith, Conway, and Aumann | |
2010-04-01 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2010-04-01 | House Requests Senate Recede | |
2010-04-01 | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2010-03-24 | Third Reading Passed (141-0) | |
2010-03-23 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-23 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-26 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | |
2010-02-17 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m. | |
2010-02-17 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-02-10 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-05 | First Reading Appropriations |