MD HB765 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-10 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-10 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering specified permissible investments of State money by the Treasurer of the State; establishing specified purposes for cash portfolio management by the Treasurer; and authorizing the Treasurer to sell, redeem, lend, exchange, and enter into repurchase and reverse-repurchase agreements for specified investments.
Title
State Treasury - Permissible Investments of State Money
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-10 | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations Withdrawn | |
2010-02-17 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m. | |
2010-02-17 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-02-10 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-05 | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/HB0765.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/hb/hb0765f.pdf |