MD HB764 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 92
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 92
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the terms and conditions of a certain final offer that the Executive Director of the Housing Opportunities Commission of Montgomery County is required to submit to the Montgomery Commission; authorizing the parties to a collective bargaining agreement for employees of the Montgomery Commission to request the services of a mediator-arbitrator during a term of a collective bargaining agreement under certain circumstances; and establishing the process for mediation-arbitration.
Title
Montgomery County Housing Opportunities Commission - Collective Bargaining Agreement Implementation - Impasse Arbitration MC 10-23
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-11 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 92 |
2023-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2023-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2023-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {623121/1 Adopted |
2023-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2023-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-08 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Arbitration
Collective Bargaining
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Price Index
Counties - Local Laws
Hearings
Housing
Local Government Mandates
Montgomery County
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment
Collective Bargaining
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Price Index
Counties - Local Laws
Hearings
Housing
Local Government Mandates
Montgomery County
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Housing and Community Development | 16 | 310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Housing and Community Development | 16 | 310.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |