MD HB764 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-15 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a law enforcement officer from engaging in certain sexual acts, sexual contact, or vaginal intercourse with a victim, witness, or suspect in an investigation during the course of an investigation that the officer is conducting, supervising, or assisting with, or with a certain person requesting assistance from or responding to the law enforcement officer in the course of the officer's official duties; and establishing a certain exception to the prohibition under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Law - Law Enforcement Officers - Prohibition on Sexual Activity

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-15SenateHearing canceled
2020-03-10SenateHearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-06SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-05HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2020-03-03HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-03HouseFavorable with Amendments {432419/1 Adopted
2020-03-02HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2020-02-03HouseHearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-31HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Criminal Law3314(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback