MD HB760 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 315
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 315
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting, with a certain exception, a member of the Board of Directors of the Maryland School for the Blind who serves three consecutive terms from being reappointed for 1 year after completion of those terms; and authorizing the immediate reappointment of the Chairman of the Board after completion of three consecutive terms.
Title
Maryland School for the Blind - Board of Directors - Reappointments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 315 |
2020-03-17 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2020-03-11 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-10 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2020-01-31 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-31 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB640 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 316