MD HB757 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1014
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-06 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-06 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain expedited proceedings in a wrongful detainer action if the property that is the subject of the action is, at the time of the complaint, advertised or listed for sale or lease by the complainant and requiring that notice of a hearing or appeal be served in person or, under certain circumstances, posted conspicuously on the property; etc.
Title
Real Property - Expedited Wrongful Detainer Proceedings - Property for Sale or Lease
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-06 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2023-02-28 | House | Hearing canceled |
2023-02-09 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB1014 (Carry Over) 2017-02-28 - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
SB919 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-15 - First Reading Senate Rules
SB919 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-15 - First Reading Senate Rules
Subjects
Circuit Courts
District Courts
Hearings
Leases and Rent
Notices
Real Estate
Real Property
Sheriffs
Signs and Billboards
Warrants
District Courts
Hearings
Leases and Rent
Notices
Real Estate
Real Property
Sheriffs
Signs and Billboards
Warrants
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Real Property | 14 | 132 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |