MD HB754 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1084
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-06 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-06 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reclassifying as a felony instead of a misdemeanor certain sex trafficking offenses; and establishing an affirmative defense of duress if a defendant committed an alleged violation as a result of an act of another charged with violating certain prohibitions against sex trafficking.
Title
Criminal Law - Sex Trafficking - Felony
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-06 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2023-02-28 | House | Hearing canceled |
2023-02-09 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
HB1084 (Carry Over) 2019-02-11 - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
defendants
Extortion
Human Trafficking
Identification
Immigrants and Citizenship
Sexual Offenses
Victims
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
defendants
Extortion
Human Trafficking
Identification
Immigrants and Citizenship
Sexual Offenses
Victims
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Law | 3 | 1102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |