MD HB754 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a county board of education to waive high school graduation requirements established by the county board that are in addition to high school graduation requirements established by the State Board of Education for a student in foster care or who is a homeless youth if while in grade 11 or 12 the youth transfers into the local school system from a different system in the State; prohibiting a county board from waiving certain requirements; etc.
Title
Education - High School Graduation Requirements - Students in Foster Care or Homeless Youth
Sponsors
Del. Michele Guyton [D] | Del. Jessica Feldmark [D] | Del. Michael Griffith [R] | Del. Terri Hill [D] |
Del. Julian Ivey [D] | Del. C.T. Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {705566/1 Adopted |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2020-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-31 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB564 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 565
Subjects
Age
Counties
Curriculum
Education, Boards of
Foster Care
Indigent Persons
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Records
Youth
Counties
Curriculum
Education, Boards of
Foster Care
Indigent Persons
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Records
Youth