MD HB750 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a private education lender from initiating an action to collect a private education loan if the student loan borrower or cosigner would be required to demonstrate undue hardship to discharge the private education loan in bankruptcy; etc.
Title
Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Prohibition
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn |
2020-03-03 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-31 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Bankruptcy
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Education
Financial Institutions
Higher Education
Loans
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Education
Financial Institutions
Higher Education
Loans
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 5 | 1301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 5 | 1302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |