MD HB75 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 356
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 356
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering from 120 to 150 the number of days during which the Public Service Commission is required to take a final action after a gas company files an amendment to an approved plan to invest in eligible infrastructure replacement projects.
Title
Gas Companies - Infrastructure Replacement Projects - Amendment to a Plan
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 356 |
2016-03-31 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2016-02-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2016-01-28 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-01-28 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-01-27 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2016-01-21 | House | Hearing 1/21 at 3:00 p.m. |
2016-01-20 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-01-21 | House | Hearing 1/21 at 2:00 p.m. |
2016-01-15 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |