MD HB746 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB460
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring, beginning on January 1, 2023, the Maryland Medical Assistance Program to provide gender-affirming treatment; and prohibiting the Program from issuing an adverse benefit determination related to gender-affirming treatment unless a health care provider with experience prescribing or delivering gender-affirming treatment has reviewed and confirmed the appropriateness of the determination.
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Gender–Affirming Treatment (Trans Health Equity Act of 2022)
Sponsors
Del. Anne Kaiser [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-02-03 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
HB746 (Carry Over) 2022-02-15 - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
SB682 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-21 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
SB682 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-21 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Gender
Health, Department of
internet
Managed Care Organizations
Medical Assistance
Medical Treatments
Public Health
Reports
Health, Department of
internet
Managed Care Organizations
Medical Assistance
Medical Treatments
Public Health
Reports
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 15 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 15 | 150 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |