MD HB745 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a Task Force to Study the Financial Impact of Illegal Immigrants on Maryland's Job Market; providing for the composition, duties, and staff of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to report to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1, 2011; and providing for the termination of the Act.
Title
Task Force to Study the Financial Impact of Illegal Immigrants on Maryland's
Sponsors
Del. Donald Dwyer [R] | Del. Richard Impallaria [R] | Del. Wade Kach [R] | Del. Nicholaus Kipke [R] |
Del. Susan Krebs [R] | Del. Susan McComas [R] | Del. Patrick McDonough [R] | Sen. Justin Ready [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-15 | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2011-02-14 | Hearing 3/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-10 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Aliens and Citizenship
Business and Economic Development, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Legislative Services, Department of
Procurement
Reports
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment
Business and Economic Development, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Legislative Services, Department of
Procurement
Reports
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2011rs/billfile/HB0745.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2011rs/bills/hb/hb0745f.pdf |