MD HB740 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-01 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-01 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Making unenforceable a provision of a declaration, a bylaw, a contract for sale of a unit, or any other instrument made by a developer relating to residential condominiums that purports to shorten the statute of limitations for specified claims, purports to waive the application of a specified accrual date for specified claims, operates to prevent the filing of a lawsuit or other proceeding within an applicable statute of limitations, or requires the assertion of a claim within a shorter time period than applicable; etc.
Title
Residential Condominiums - Governing Documents - Claims Provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-01 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) | |
2012-03-27 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-27 | Favorable with Amendments 958679/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-04-02 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-03-22 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-04-03 | Delegates Niemann, Stein, and Norman | |
2012-04-03 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2012-04-03 | House Requests Senate Recede | |
2012-04-03 | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2012-03-21 | Third Reading Passed (130-0) | |
2012-03-20 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-20 | Favorable with Amendments 630010/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-23 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 3/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-08 | First Reading Environmental Matters |