MD HB738 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 117
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the deadlines by which a certificate of candidacy for a successor candidate for Governor or Lieutenant Governor must be filed under certain circumstances; altering the day by which a certain statement regarding certain statewide questions to appear on a ballot is required to be submitted to the State Board of Elections; authorizing an individual to receive a copy of the complete text of all constitutional amendments and questions electronically; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election Law - Certificates of Candidacy and Ballot Questions - Revisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 117
2021-04-05HouseReturned Passed
2021-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2021-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed
2021-04-01SenateFavorable Adopted
2021-04-01SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-03-18SenateHearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-02-26SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-02-25HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2021-02-23HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-02-23HouseFavorable with Amendments {765367/1 Adopted
2021-02-22HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2021-01-28HouseHearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-26HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Election Law51005(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law51101(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law5903(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law5904(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law7105(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback