MD HB735 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 618
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 618
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Reestablishing the Task Force on the Canal Place Preservation and Development Authority, which was originally established by Chapter 789 of the Acts of the General Assembly of 2018; providing for the composition, chair, staffing, and purpose of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving certain compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of certain expenses; requiring the Task Force to consult with certain entities and study and make recommendations on certain matters; etc.
Title
Task Force on the Canal Place Preservation and Development Authority - Reestablishment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 618 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2020-01-31 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-30 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB421 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 619
Subjects
Allegany County
Appraisals
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Emergency Bills
Federal Government
General Services, Department of
Historical Matters
Legislation
Municipal Corporations
Operating Budget
Planning, Department of
Reports
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Sunset
Appraisals
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Emergency Bills
Federal Government
General Services, Department of
Historical Matters
Legislation
Municipal Corporations
Operating Budget
Planning, Department of
Reports
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Sunset