MD HB732 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing certain tax rates on cigarettes and other tobacco products; imposing a sales and use tax rate of 12% on electronic smoking devices; requiring the Governor to include at least $18,250,000 in the annual budget for fiscal year 2022 and each fiscal year thereafter for certain smoking cessation activities; requiring the Comptroller to distribute certain revenue attributable to certain taxes to The Blueprint for Maryland's Future Fund; imposing a tax on certain revenues from certain digital advertising services in the State; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxation – Tobacco Tax, Sales and Use Tax, and Digital Advertising Gross Revenues Tax

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 88 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Readings Passed with Amendments (Y: 29 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Floor Amendment 363920/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (Y: 14 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 89 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-07HouseVetoed by the Governor (Policy)
2020-03-18HousePassed Enrolled
2020-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (88-47)
2020-03-18HouseHouse Concurs Senate Amendments
2020-03-17SenateThird Readings Passed with Amendments (29-16)
2020-03-17SenateFloor Amendment {363920/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (14-31)
2020-03-17SenateFloor Committee Amendment {679237/1 Budget and Taxation Adopted
2020-03-17SenateFloor Amendment {433624/2 (Senator Hough) Adopted
2020-03-17SenateFloor Amendment {293522/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected
2020-03-17SenateMotion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
2020-03-17SenateFloor Amendment {293522/1 (Senator Jennings)
2020-03-16SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-16SenateFavorable with Amendments {549037/1 Adopted
2020-03-16SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2020-03-14SenateReassigned to Budget and Taxation
2020-03-13SenateReferred Finance Budget and Taxation
2020-03-12HouseThird Reading Passed (89-44)
2020-03-10HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-10HouseFavorable with Amendments {915466/2 Adopted
2020-03-09HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2020-02-04HouseHearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
2020-02-03HouseReassigned to Ways and Means Economic Matters
2020-01-30HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters and Ways and Means

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business Regulation5101(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Regulation7101(n/a)See Bill Text
Education5219(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General131015(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General11104(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General12101(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General12102(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General12105(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General12201(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General12302(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General21303(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General21602.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0732?ys=2020RS
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb0732f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb0732t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb0732e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0732_91546602.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0732_54903701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0732_29352201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0732_43362402.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0732_67923701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0732_36392001.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes_comm/hb0732_ecm.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/House/0522.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/Senate/0905.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/Senate/0906.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/House/1218.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback