MD HB731 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a certain formula for the calculation of a certain child support obligation under the child support guidelines when a parent with shared physical custody keeps the child or children overnight for more than 25%, at least 92 overnights, but less than 30%, not more than 109 overnights, of the year; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Support - Shared Physical Custody

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2019-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {782818/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2019-02-08HouseHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback