MD HB729 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB803
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring each public senior higher education institution to be carbon neutral for certain emissions on or before January 1, 2025, and January 1, 2035; specifying certain requirements that a public senior higher education institution must meet to achieve the carbon neutral requirements under the Act; requiring each public senior higher education institution to designate, on or before August 1, 2022, a certain individual to implement and monitor the institution's progress with certain requirements; etc.
Title
Facilitating University Transformations by Unifying Reductions in Emissions (FUTURE) Act
Sponsors
Del. Jared Solomon [D] | Del. Mark Chang [D] | Del. David Fraser-hidalgo [D] | Del. Marc Korman [D] |
Del. Mary Lehman [D] | Del. Emily Shetty [D] | Del. Stephanie Smith [D] | Del. Jen Terrasa [D] |
Del. Pat Young [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-03 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
HB803 (Carry Over) 2021-02-11 - Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
SB471 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-31 - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
SB471 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-31 - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Agriculture
Air Pollution
Appropriations
Budgets
Commuters
Energy Matters
Environment
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Fuel
Grants
Health
Heating and Cooling
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
meetings
Motor Vehicles
Natural Resources, Department of
Power Plants
Refuse Disposal
Renewable Energy Sources
Reports
Residency
Revenue and Taxes
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Sewage
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Time
Utilities
Water
Weights and Measures
Air Pollution
Appropriations
Budgets
Commuters
Energy Matters
Environment
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Fuel
Grants
Health
Heating and Cooling
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
meetings
Motor Vehicles
Natural Resources, Department of
Power Plants
Refuse Disposal
Renewable Energy Sources
Reports
Residency
Revenue and Taxes
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Sewage
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Time
Utilities
Water
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 10 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 15 | 134 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 3901 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0729?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/hb/hb0729f.pdf |