MD HB717 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 368
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 368
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the State Board of Nursing to appoint peer advisory committees to provide advice related to midwifery; authorizing registered nurses certified as nurse-midwives and licensed certified midwives to personally prepare and dispense a starter dosage of certain drugs under certain circumstances; altering the exceptions to the certified midwifery licensure requirement and the qualifications required for a license; etc.
Title
State Board of Nursing - Peer Advisory Committees, Scopes of Practice, and Licensure Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 368 |
2023-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2023-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-6) |
2023-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {663628/1 Adopted |
2023-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2023-02-14 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-07 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB772 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 367
Subjects
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Drugs
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Job Training
Licenses
Medical Treatments
Medication Technicians
Midwives
Nurses
Pregnancy
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Work, Labor, and Employment
Committees and Commissions
Drugs
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Job Training
Licenses
Medical Treatments
Medication Technicians
Midwives
Nurses
Pregnancy
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 12 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 8 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 8 | 503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 8 | 508 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 8 | 601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 8 | 6A-01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 8 | 6A-02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 8 | 6D-01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 8 | 6D-02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 8 | 6D-03 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |