MD HB710 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-17 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Department of Health, under the Maryland Medical Assistance Program, to reimburse a dental provider for services rendered by a student of dentistry who is engaged in an educational program at a school of dentistry that meets certain requirements and is providing services under the supervision of a licensed dentist.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Medical Assistance Programs - Dental Providers and Dental Students - Reimbursement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-17HouseWithdrawn by Sponsor
2021-01-29HouseHearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-26HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SB465 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-19 - Withdrawn by Sponsor

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General15114.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback