MD SB465 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-19 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-19 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health, under the Maryland Medical Assistance Program, to reimburse a dental provider for services rendered by a student of dentistry who is engaged in an educational program at a school of dentistry that meets certain requirements and is providing services under the supervision of a licensed dentist.
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Programs - Dental Providers and Dental Students - Reimbursement
Sponsors
Sen. Chris West [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-19 | Senate | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB710 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-17 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Subjects
Dentists
Health, Department of
Medical Assistance
Medical Schools
Public Health
Reimbursement Rates
Students
Health, Department of
Medical Assistance
Medical Schools
Public Health
Reimbursement Rates
Students
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 15 | 114.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |