MD HB709 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 635
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing the maximum penalty for being an accessory after the fact to murder in the first degree from 5 years to 10 years; increasing the maximum penalty for being an accessory after the fact to murder in the second degree from 5 years to 10 years; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Law - Accessory After the Fact - Murder (The Sheddy-Bennett Act)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-16HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 635
2013-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2013-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2013-04-02SenateSecond Reading Passed
2013-04-02SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2013-04-01SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2013-03-08SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2013-03-07HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2013-03-05HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2013-03-05HouseFavorable with Amendments {652812/1 Report Adopted
2013-03-04HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2013-02-19HouseHearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2013-02-04HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0709?ys=2013rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/bills/hb/hb0709f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/bills/hb/hb0709t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/Chapters_noln/CH_635_hb0709t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2013RS/amds/bil_0009/hb0709_65281201.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/fnotes/bil_0009/hb0709.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/votes_comm/hb0709_jud.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/votes_comm/hb0709_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0709,h-0220&stab=02&ys=2013RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0709,s-0928&stab=02&ys=2013RS

Bill Comments

feedback