MD HB707 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-8)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-8)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting an individual from committing certain drunk or drugged driving offenses if the individual has been convicted previously for certain other crimes under certain circumstances; establishing certain penalties; and increasing certain penalties for certain convictions of driving while impaired by alcohol while transporting a minor.
Title
Drunk and Drugged Driving Offenses – Penalties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 20 |
2019-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2019-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {802410/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2019-03-05 | House | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-25 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-07 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Boats and Ships
Drunk and Drugged Driving
Homicide
Manslaughter
Motor Vehicles
Penalties and Sentences
Repeate Offenders
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving
Drunk and Drugged Driving
Homicide
Manslaughter
Motor Vehicles
Penalties and Sentences
Repeate Offenders
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving