MD HB703 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB257
Note: Carry Foward to future SB236
Note: Carry Foward to future SB236
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Commission on Civil Rights to include certain information in its annual report; requiring certain county offices of civil rights to report certain information relating to complaints of employment discrimination to the Commission; making the reporting requirement applicable only in Anne Arundel County, Baltimore City, Baltimore County, Howard County, Montgomery County, and Prince George's County; etc.
Title
Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Employment Discrimination - Reporting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2020-03-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {846383/1 Adopted |
2020-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-01-30 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-30 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
HB703 (Carry Over) 2020-03-12 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
HB703 (Carry Over) 2020-03-12 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
HB703 (Carry Over) 2020-03-12 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Subjects
Anne Arundel County
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Commission on Civil Rights
Communications
Data
Discrimination
Howard County
Human Relations
Human Rights
Local Government Mandates
Montgomery County
Prince George's County
Public Officials
Records
Reports
Work, Labor and Employment
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Commission on Civil Rights
Communications
Data
Discrimination
Howard County
Human Relations
Human Rights
Local Government Mandates
Montgomery County
Prince George's County
Public Officials
Records
Reports
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 20 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 20 | 208 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |