MD SB236 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB703
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 220
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 220
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Commission on Civil Rights to include a review of certain data and recommendations, if any, for policy changes to address discriminatory trends noted in the data in its annual report; requiring certain county offices of civil rights, or other appropriate agencies, to report certain information relating to complaints of employment discrimination to the Commission; making the reporting requirement applicable only in certain counties; etc.
Title
Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Employment Discrimination - Reporting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 220 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-03-29 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2021-03-25 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-24 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2021-03-20 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-03-17 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-11 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {798374/1 Adopted |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-12-28 | Senate | Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2020-09-06 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB257 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 219
HB703 (Carry Over) 2020-03-12 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
HB703 (Carry Over) 2020-03-12 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Anne Arundel County
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Commission on Civil Rights
Data
Discrimination
Howard County
Human Relations
Local Government Mandates
Montgomery County
Prince George's County
Reports
Work, Labor, and Employment
Anne Arundel County
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Commission on Civil Rights
Data
Discrimination
Howard County
Human Relations
Local Government Mandates
Montgomery County
Prince George's County
Reports
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 20 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 20 | 208 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |