MD HB698 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-02 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-02 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Maryland Model Prisons Study Workgroup to develop a plan to bring about fundamental changes to the culture and practices of State prisons and to consult with certain social justice organizations as part of the process; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Workgroup; authorizing the reimbursement of certain expenses; requiring the Workgroup to report and make recommendations the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2021; etc.
Title
Maryland Model Prisons Study Workgroup
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2021-02-24 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-26 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Correctional Institutions
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
Juvenile Law
Public Safety
Reports
Sunset
Correctional Institutions
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
Juvenile Law
Public Safety
Reports
Sunset