MD HB691 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-7)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-14 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-14 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a requirement that a petition for guardianship of a disabled person include signed and verified certificates of competency by providing that the certificates may be signed and verified by a nurse practitioner and certain other health care practitioners; altering the requirements for the certification of a patient's incapacity to make an informed decision regarding treatment or of a patient's terminal or end-stage condition to allow the second individual making the certification to be a nurse practitioner; etc.
Title
Health Occupations - Nurse Practitioners - Certifications of Competency and Incapacity
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2020-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {686485/1 Adopted |
2020-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-30 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB576 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 568
Subjects
Advance Medical Directives
Certifications
Disabilities
Estates and Trusts
Evidence
Examinations
Health Occupations
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Nurses
Parents and Guardians
Patients
Petitions
Physicians
Public Health
Signatures
Vulnerable Adults
Certifications
Disabilities
Estates and Trusts
Evidence
Examinations
Health Occupations
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Nurses
Parents and Guardians
Patients
Petitions
Physicians
Public Health
Signatures
Vulnerable Adults
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Estates and Trusts | 13 | 705 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 5 | 606 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |