MD HB687 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 633
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 633
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Commission on Child Custody Decision Making; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Commission; prohibiting a member of the Commission from receiving compensation but authorizing specified reimbursement; requiring the Commission to study the practice, principles, and process for child custody decision making in Maryland; requiring the Commission to submit specified reports to the Governor and the General Assembly, with the final report due on or before December 1, 2014; etc.
Title
Commission on Child Custody Decision Making
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-1) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-6) (Y: 131 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-6) (Y: 131 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 633 |
2013-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-1) |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-6) |
2013-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {402510/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2013-02-28 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Administrative Office of the Courts
Child Custody
Committees and Commissions
Courts
Family Law
Hearings
Judges
Reports
Sunset
Child Custody
Committees and Commissions
Courts
Family Law
Hearings
Judges
Reports
Sunset