MD HB684 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB477
Note: Carry Over of previous HB881
Note: Carry Over of previous HB881
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a county to adopt by local law or ordinance provisions prohibiting a landlord of residential property from failing to renew a lease or from terminating a holdover tenancy without just cause; and establishing certain requirements for a local law or ordinance adopted in accordance with the Act.
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases and Holdover Tenancies - Local Just Cause Termination Provisions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
HB684 (Carry Over) 2023-02-07 - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
SB504 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-14 - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
HB881 (Carry Over) 2022-02-09 - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
SB504 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-14 - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
HB881 (Carry Over) 2022-02-09 - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Real Property | 8 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 8 | 402.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0684?ys=2023RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/bills/hb/hb0684f.pdf |