MD HB683 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Board of Education of Baltimore County to meet and confer with an employee organization representing specified certificated and noncertificated employees by November 1, 2011, regarding the job titles to be included in the unit.
Title
Baltimore County - Public School Employees - Collective Bargaining Units
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 38 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 38 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-08 | Third Reading Passed (44-1) | |
2011-04-07 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-07 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-11 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2011-04-11 | Re-referred Finance | |
2011-04-06 | First Reading Senate Rules | |
2011-04-09 | Returned Passed | |
2011-04-07 | Third Reading Passed (99-38) | |
2011-04-05 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-09 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | |
2011-02-16 | Hearing 3/9 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-10 | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Auditors and Audits
Baltimore County
Collective Bargaining
Education, Boards of
Fees
Liability
Public Employees
Teachers
Unions
Work, Labor and Employment
Baltimore County
Collective Bargaining
Education, Boards of
Fees
Liability
Public Employees
Teachers
Unions
Work, Labor and Employment