MD HB676 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Making unenforceable a provision of declaration, a bylaw, a contract for the initial sale of a unit, or any other instrument made by a developer or vendor in accordance with specified provisions of law under specified circumstances; and applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Title
Condominiums - Unenforceability of Certain Provisions of Governing Documents
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-29 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2017-03-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2017-03-28 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-28 | House | Favorable with Amendments {420718/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-27 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-02-14 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-01 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Alternative Dispute Resolution
Arbitration
Civil Actions
Claims
Committees and Commissions
Condominiums
Contracts
Mediation
Notices
Real Property
Rules and Regulations
Statutes of Limitation
Voting
Warranties
Arbitration
Civil Actions
Claims
Committees and Commissions
Condominiums
Contracts
Mediation
Notices
Real Property
Rules and Regulations
Statutes of Limitation
Voting
Warranties