MD HB665 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-18 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-18 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the placement and use of speed monitoring systems on highways in Montgomery County that are at high risk for certain motor vehicle crashes; prohibiting the placement and use of speed monitoring systems on certain highways in Montgomery County; requiring the fines collected by Montgomery County or by a municipal government in Montgomery County as a result of violations enforced by a speed monitoring system to be used to fund the study, design, and construction of certain safety-related projects; etc.
Title
Montgomery County - Speed Monitoring Systems - High-Risk Highways MC 15-24
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 106 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2024-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (106-26) |
2024-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {723623/1 Adopted |
2024-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2024-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-25 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Accidents
Construction
Counties - Local Laws
Fines
Highways
Local Government Mandates
Montgomery County
Municipal Corporations
Safety
studies
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Construction
Counties - Local Laws
Fines
Highways
Local Government Mandates
Montgomery County
Municipal Corporations
Safety
studies
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 7 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 21 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 21 | 809 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |