MD HB664 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 469
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 469
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a child care program to provide to parents or guardians of a child under the age of 3 years information about the Maryland Infants and Toddlers Program and contact information for the local agency responsible for administering the Program; requiring a child care program to assist a parent or guardian with scheduling a time and location for the administering agency of the Program to provide a certain screening; and requiring the State Department of Education to provide certain information to child care programs.
Title
Child Care Programs – Maryland Infants and Toddlers Program – Information and Assistance
Sponsors
Del. Michele Guyton [D] | Del. Michael Griffith [R] | Del. Shaneka Henson [D] | Del. Faye Howell [D] |
Del. Jen Terrasa [D] | Del. Nicole Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 469 |
2022-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2022-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {873428/1 Adopted |
2022-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2022-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Age
Child Care
Children
Communications
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Mobile Devices
Parents and Guardians
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Age
Child Care
Children
Communications
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Mobile Devices
Parents and Guardians
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 5 | 115 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |